This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 11:06:09 (UTC).

TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION V WILLIAMS, JUANYA JUSTYCE

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against WILLIAMS, JUANYA JUSTYCE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant and Respondent

WILLIAMS , JUANYA JUSTYCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KLIGLER , JOSHUA C

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/05/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/05/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $495.00 ON RECEIPT 4415618

04/06/2022:PAID $495.00 ON RECEIPT 4415618

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

04/06/2022:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

AFFIDAVIT

04/12/2022:AFFIDAVIT

ANSWER

04/25/2022:ANSWER

AFFIDAVIT

05/12/2022:AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes: OF DENIAL OF AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REPLEVIN F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: TO COMPLAINT F/B DFT AS PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes: FB PLT- IN SUPPORT OF ORDER OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: JUANYA JUSTYCE WILLIAMS -SUBSTITUTE SERVED COREY WEST, CO-RESIDENT 04/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4415618; Receipt Amount: $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $495.00; total Amount Paid: $495.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/06/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/06/2022; Description: 4R7FF County Civil Claim >$15000 <=$30000 w/Replevin; Amount Due: $485.00; Amount Paid: $485.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Notes: MAY 19 2022 @ 11AM VIA ZOOM -JUDGE GARRISON 4/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $495.00 ON RECEIPT 4415618; Notes: $495.00 4415618 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: joshua.kligler@dunnlawpa.com;paula.martinez@dunnlawpa.com;collections@dunnlawpa.com 20 DAY SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLIGLER , JOSHUA C