This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 19:28:34 (UTC).

TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION V BOUYER, ROBERTA D

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOUYER, ROBERTA D. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant and Respondent

BOUYER , ROBERTA D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KLIGLER , JOSHUA C

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

STIBERMAN , ROBERT ARIEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/30/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/30/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4124776

08/02/2021:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4124776

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/19/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/24/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/24/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/24/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/24/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/24/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

STIPULATION

09/07/2021:STIPULATION

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 32874 PAGE 1262-1262

09/08/2021:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 32874 PAGE 1262-1262

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

09/15/2021:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PLT NO APPEARANCE DFT NO APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:4C (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCancelled SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney on 9/14/2021 9:00:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 32874 PAGE 1262-1262; Notes:ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT & DISMISSING CASE -JUDGE CASTOR 9/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Notes:STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO PLAINTIFF. F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO PLAINTIFF. F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO SERVE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT. F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4124776; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/02/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/02/2021; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:JOSHUA.KLIGLER@DUNNLAWPA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 9/14/2021 9:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 9/14/2021 9:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4124776; Notes:$185.00 4124776 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLIGLER , JOSHUA C