This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/16/2022 at 11:06:45 (UTC).

TRI COUNTY DIAGNOSTIC & IMAGING CENTERS LLC A/A/O JAMES AIMABLE V THE HERTZ CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 TRI COUNTY DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING CENTERS LLC A/A/O JAMES AIMABLE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE HERTZ CORPORATION. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURKE , LAUREN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURKE , LAUREN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TRI COUNTY DIAGNOSTIC & IMAGING CENTERS LLC A/A/O JAMES AIMABLE

Respondent and Defendant

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY E

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

LANAO , JARIO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/11/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ORDER OF DEFAULT

08/10/2022:ORDER OF DEFAULT

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/10/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AFFIDAVIT

08/08/2022:AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

08/08/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/08/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/08/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/08/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

08/08/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ORDER SETTING HEARING

08/03/2022:ORDER SETTING HEARING

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

07/29/2022:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND DENYING JOINT REQUEST TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - JUDGE BURKE DTD 7/29/22

07/29/2022:ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND DENYING JOINT REQUEST TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - JUDGE BURKE DTD 7/29/22

E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING

07/14/2022:E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING

E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING

07/14/2022:E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING

E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING

07/14/2022:E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING

DEMAND FOR:

07/14/2022:DEMAND FOR:

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

07/14/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/14/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes: DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: WITHOUT PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes: VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DEFAULT; Notes: AND ORDER TO ADVANCE THE CAUSE WITHIN 45 DAYS - SIGNED JUDGE BURKE 8/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes: OF DAMAGES AND ATTY TIME F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE F/B GREGORY E GUDIN ESQ OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DFT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DFT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: FIRST REQUEST F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4518009; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/28/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/28/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EFILINGS@PIP-LAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 8/4/2022 2:30 PM BURKE, LAUREN; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 8/4/2022 2:30 PM BURKE, LAUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4518009; Notes: $65.00 4518009 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.