This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/11/2019 at 15:23:11 (UTC).

TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 20175 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE V TRANKOWSKI, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 20175 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TRANKOWSKI, ROBERT. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , JANIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , JANIS

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 20175 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE

Respondents and Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT TRANKOWSKI

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION #2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DOROTHEA TRANKOWSKI

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION #1

TRANKOWSKI , ROBERT

TRANKOWSKI , DOROTHEA

BRIDGEVIEW ASSOCIATION INC

BANK OF AMERICA NA

ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES INCLUDING IF A NAMED DEFENDANT IS DECEASED THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES THE SURVIVING SPOUSE HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES CREDITORS AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THAT DEFENDANT AND ALL CLAIMANTS PERSO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ROSALER , BRIAN L

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

EANNARINO , JEFFREY S

FEFFER , LAUREN B

DROSKY , TODD C

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/27/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/05/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

03/28/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/19/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE DUPLICATE COVER SHEET

01/25/2019:NOTICE DUPLICATE COVER SHEET

DOR FORECLOSURE FORM

05/22/2019:DOR FORECLOSURE FORM

ANSWER

03/04/2019:ANSWER

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/25/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - 6-26-2019; Notes:PLEADINGS@POPKINROSALER.COM; ESERVICE@EANNARINOLAW.COM; FLSERVICE@FLWLAW.COM; LFEFFER@ROSENBAUMPLLC.COM 172782701

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 30741 PAGE 596-596; Notes:ISSUED TO TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2017-5, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE PLEADINGS@POPKINROSALER.COM; ESERVICE@EANNARINOLAW.COM; FLSERVICE@FLWLAW.COM; LFEFFER@ROSENBAUMPLLC.COM 172782701

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $0.70 ON RECEIPT 3225496; Notes:$0.70 3225496 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FEES ADDED - 6-26-2019; Notes:172782701

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE - 6-26-2019; Notes:SOLD TO: TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2017-5 US BANK NATIONAL ASSN TRUSTEE FOR: 100.00 PLEADINGS@POPKINROSALER.COM; ESERVICE@EANNARINOLAW.COM; FLSERVICE@FLWLAW.COM; LFEFFER@ROSENBAUMPLLC.COM 172782701

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE PROCESS SALE - 6-26-2019; Notes:1 100.00 135669.41 BID SHEET AND INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED 6-26-2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $140.00 ON RECEIPT 3224760; Notes:$140.00 3224760 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION; Notes:NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE, SALE DATE 06/26/2019; Notes:AMENDED F/B PLTS ATTY 06/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE, SALE DATE 06/26/2016; Notes:6/26/16 TOWD POINT V ROBERT TRANKOWSKI 06/26/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketDue Date:06/26/2019; Description:CA Foreclosure Sale Fee; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDue Date:01/29/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDue Date:01/29/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDue Date:01/29/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDue Date:01/29/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDue Date:01/29/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDue Date:01/29/2019; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDue Date:01/29/2019; Description:Efile fee INDX $1 fee party after 4; Amount Due:$2.00; Amount Paid:$2.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDue Date:01/29/2019; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDue Date:01/29/2019; Description:800F2 CircCivil Real Prop $50,001 < $250,000 PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIDGEVIEW ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2017 is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Feffer, Lauren B.