This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/29/2021 at 19:26:16 (UTC).

TOTAL MD A/A/O EBONY LEWIS V PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 TOTAL MD A/A/O EBONY LEWIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TOTAL MD A/A/O EBONY LEWIS

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SAGIV , DANIEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/24/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/24/2021:COMPLAINT

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4259947

11/24/2021:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4259947

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/17/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCancelled SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP on 1/4/2022 9:30:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITH PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4259947; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$65.00; total Amount Paid:$65.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/24/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/24/2021; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:DANIEL@DANIELSAGIVLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 1/4/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 1/4/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4259947; Notes:$65.00 4259947 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Total MD is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sagiv, Daniel