This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/14/2023 at 10:35:44 (UTC).

TORRES, PAIGE V PHANTOM FIREWORKS EASTERN REGION LLC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 TORRES, PAIGE filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against PHANTOM FIREWORKS EASTERN REGION LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TORRES , PAIGE

Respondents and Defendants

PHANTOM FIREWORKS COMPANY LLC

PHANTOM FIREWORKS EASTERN REGION LLC

PHANTOM IMPORTING & DISTRIBUTING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JACOBSON , JOSHUA R

PATTERSON , MARK

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

ROTUNNO , MICHAEL C

 

Court Documents

WITNESS LIST

12/29/2022:WITNESS LIST

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/15/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/15/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

10/21/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

10/21/2022:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

10/14/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/26/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/26/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER

08/23/2022:DCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/01/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/01/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/01/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/01/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4409685

04/01/2022:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4409685

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

03/30/2022:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/30/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS LIST; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT PHANTOM FIREWORKS SHOWROOMS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT PHANTOM IMPORTING & DISTRIBUTING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' PHANTOM FIREWORKS SHOWROOMS, LLC AND PHANTOM IMPORTING AND DISTRIBUTING, LLC'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PAIGE TORRES, IN HER CAPACITY AS PARENT AND LEGAL GUARDIAN OF J.S., A MINOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OBJECTIONS AND ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS PHANTOM FIREWORKS SHOWROOMS, LLC AND PHANTOM IMPORTING AND DISTRIBUTING, LLC'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PAIGE TORRES, PARENT & LEGAL GUARDIAN OF J.S., A MINOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER; Notes: CURLEY; COMMENCING 5/8/2023 THROUGH 6/30/2023 DTD 8/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT PHANTOM FIREWORKS EASTERN REGION, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT PHANTOM FIREWORKS COMPANY, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, PHANTOM FIREWORKS EASTERN REGION, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, PHANTOM FIREWORKS COMPANY, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4409685; Notes: $421.00 4409685 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: jjacobson@forthepeople.com;kdimeglio@forthepeople.com;taide@forthepeople.com AS TO PHANTOM FIREWORKS EASTERN REGION LLC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: jjacobson@forthepeople.com;kdimeglio@forthepeople.com;taide@forthepeople.com AS TO PHANTOM FIREWORKS COMPANY LLC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less