This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/21/2019 at 01:34:48 (UTC).

THIRD FEDERAL SAVINGS & LOAN ASSOCIATION OF CLEVELAND V MARTINEZ, LUIS L

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 THIRD FEDERAL SAVINGS LOAN ASSOCIATION OF CLEVELAND filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARTINEZ, LUIS L. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROWE , CYMONIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROWE , CYMONIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

THIRD FEDERAL SAVINGS & LOAN ASSOCIATION OF CLEVELAND

Defendants and Respondents

ROSEWOOD CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

CLERK OF COURT IN AND FOR PLAM BEACH COUNTY FLORIDA

MARTINEZ , LUIS L

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

STATE OF FLORIDA

PALM BEACH COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUIS L MARTINEZ

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

4844 CORP

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KISER , AMY M

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MONTEKIO , MICHELLE

PETERSON , HAMPTON C

DUNN , MARK S

 

Court Documents

PAID $129,283.50 ON RECEIPT 3225319

06/26/2019:PAID $129,283.50 ON RECEIPT 3225319

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

06/26/2019:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PAID $140.00 ON RECEIPT 3216563

06/20/2019:PAID $140.00 ON RECEIPT 3216563

RETURNED MAIL

05/31/2019:RETURNED MAIL

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

04/24/2019:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

CLERK'S DEFAULT

04/01/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

02/04/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

02/04/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/04/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

02/01/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

ANSWER

01/08/2019:ANSWER

DISCLAIMER

12/19/2018:DISCLAIMER

PAID $1,028.10 ON RECEIPT 2934957

11/27/2018:PAID $1,028.10 ON RECEIPT 2934957

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/26/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/26/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/26/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/26/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/26/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 30741 PAGE 955-955; Notes:ISSUED TO 104 ANDOVER COURT LLC AVI@DNAREAL.US; EMAILSERVICE@GILBERTGROUPLAW.COM; COLLECTIONS@TUCKERTIGHE.COM; COATTYFORECLOSURES@PBCGOV.COM; OAG.FORECLOSE.ESERVE@MYFLORIDALEGAL.COM 172775018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $129,283.50 ON RECEIPT 3225319; Notes:$129,283.50 3225319 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED - 6-26-19; Notes:172775018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE - 6-26-19; Notes:SOLD TO 104 ANDOVER COURT LLC FOR $133,000 AVI@DNAREAL.US; EMAILSERVICE@GILBERTGROUPLAW.COM; COLLECTIONS@TUCKERTIGHE.COM; COATTYFORECLOSURES@PBCGOV.COM; OAG.FORECLOSE.ESERVE@MYFLORIDALEGAL.COM 172775018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $6,650.00 ON RECEIPT 3224806; Notes:$6,650.00 3224806 Balance Due: $129,283.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FORECLOSURE PROCESS SALE - 6-26-19; Notes:0 133000.00 143449.41 BID SHEET & INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED 6-26-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Notes:NOTICE OF SALE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER 45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $140.00 ON RECEIPT 3216563; Notes:$140.00 3216563 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE NOSA ORDER CONFIRMATION; Notes:NOSA ORDER CONFIRMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUIS L MARTINEZ A/K/A LUIS MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$12.50; Amount Paid:$12.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:800F2 CircCivil Real Prop $50,001 < $250,000 PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less