Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 01:37:34 (UTC).

THIRD FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF CLEVELAND V SIEGEL, JUNE

Case Summary

On 09/18/2012 THIRD FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF CLEVELAND filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SIEGEL, JUNE. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILLEN , JEFFREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILLEN , JEFFREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

THIRD FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF CLEVELAND

Defendants and Respondents

SIEGEL, JUNE

DEATON, MARY J

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARY J DEATON

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MARY J DEATON

POINCIANA LAKES RECREATION ASSOCIATION INC

POINCIANA LAKES BUILDING E CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

POINCIANA VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

VOURDERIS, MARINOS

VOURDERIS ENTERPRISES LP

UNKNOWN TENANT #1 IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

UNKNOWN TENANT #2 IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

WXXI PUBLIC BROADCASTING COUNCIL

VOURDERIS , MARINOS

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF SEYMOUR SIEGEL AKA SEYMORE SEIGEL

SIEGEL , JUNE

SEIGEL , ALAN

ESTATE OF SEYMOUR SIEGEL A/K/A SEYMOUR SEIGEL, DECEASED

SEIGEL , JUDY

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF SEYMOUR SIEGEL A/K/A SEYMOURL SIEGEL, DECEA

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ST LOUIS , VLADIMIR R

KENNADY , MARIAN

FORMAN , LANCE E

LONG , MORGAN E

VAN NESS , J ANTHONY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FEFFER , LAUREN B

KEEGAN , MARK G

DAMIANAKIS ESQ, ANTHONE

VALENTE JR JR, PHILIP L

WEITZMAN , LINDA S

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

08/29/2017:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

08/14/2017:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

07/05/2017:RETURNED MAIL

AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLT'S MOTION TO AMEND BY INTERLINEATION AND GRANTING DFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND: PLT'S MOTION TO AMEND BY INTERLINEATION GRANTED. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS AMENDED TO ALLEE THE FOLLOGING IN PARAGRAPH 14.DFT, ALAN SEIGEL HAS 10 DAYS TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. DTD 11-29-16 J GILLEN

11/29/2016:AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLT'S MOTION TO AMEND BY INTERLINEATION AND GRANTING DFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND: PLT'S MOTION TO AMEND BY INTERLINEATION GRANTED. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS AMENDED TO ALLEE THE FOLLOGING IN PARAGRAPH 14.DFT, ALAN SEIGEL HAS 10 DAYS TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. DTD 11-29-16 J GILLEN

LIS PENDENS BOOK 28654 PAGE 275-276

10/20/2016:LIS PENDENS BOOK 28654 PAGE 275-276

WITNESS LIST

09/20/2016:WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/16/2016:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/13/2016:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO AMEND BY INTERLINATION TO PLEAD ATTORNEY'S FEES F\B DFT, ALAN SEIGEL

09/12/2016:MOTION TO AMEND BY INTERLINATION TO PLEAD ATTORNEY'S FEES F\B DFT, ALAN SEIGEL

AFFIDAVIT

01/25/2016:AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

04/28/2015:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

ORDER

03/12/2015:ORDER

RETURNED MAIL

03/31/2014:RETURNED MAIL

AFFIDAVIT

08/07/2013:AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/03/2012:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

11/29/2012:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/28/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/28/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

190 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AGREED ORDER DENYING PLT'S AND DFT'S MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO FS 57.105 DENIED WITH PREJUDICE AND CANCELLING HEARING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 26 2017 CANCELLED DTD 09/25/17 J GILLEN; Notes:DENYING PLT'S AND DFT'S MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO FS 57.105 DENIED WITH PREJUDICE AND CANCELLING HEARING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 26 2017 CANCELLED DTD 09/25/17 J GILLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:9/25/17 @ 8:45 AM CR 9A F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO SECTION 57.105 FLORIDA STATUTES F/B PLT; Notes:FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO SECTION 57.105 FLORIDA STATUTES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:CROSS NOTICE ON 9/26/17 @ 8:15 AM CR 9A F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:JUDY SEIGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:CURRENT TENANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:WESLEY DEATON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:UNKNOWN HEIRS OF MARY J DEATON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Notes:AMENDED TITLE ISSUED TO THIRD FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF CLEVELAND BOOK 29313 PAGE 0591

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes:F/B DFT ALAN SEIGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
218 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2016
  • Due Date:10/21/2016; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Due Date:10/21/2016; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Due Date:10/20/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • Due Date:04/03/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$37.50; Amount Paid:$30.00; Amount Balance:$7.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • Due Date:03/12/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Due Date:12/12/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Due Date:12/12/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Due Date:09/24/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$109.00; Amount Paid:$109.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Due Date:09/24/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Due Date:09/24/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THIRD FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF CLEVELAND is a litigant

Latest cases where POINCIANA VILLAGE TWO ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Feffer, Lauren B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEITZMAN , LINDA S