This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/10/2022 at 22:51:05 (UTC).

THE PRADO CONDOMINIUM WPB ASSOCIATION INC V RICKEY BROWN TRUSTEE OF THE 600 LAND TRUST DATED OCTOBER 27,2019

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 THE PRADO CONDOMINIUM WPB ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RICKEY BROWN TRUSTEE OF THE 600 LAND TRUST DATED OCTOBER 27,2019. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

THE PRADO CONDOMINIUM WPB ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Respondents

KNOBLOCH , EDYTA

RICKEY BROWN TRUSTEE OF THE 600 LAND TRUST DATED OCTOBER 27,2019

TENANT , UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GREEN , KAREN A

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LEFF , BARRY M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/31/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/31/2022:COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

08/31/2022:LIS PENDENS

PAID $406.60 ON RECEIPT 4596766

08/31/2022:PAID $406.60 ON RECEIPT 4596766

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/31/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/31/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/31/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 4601605

09/06/2022:PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 4601605

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

09/15/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

09/29/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

09/29/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION AGREED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (F/B DFT EDYTA KNOBLOCH)

09/30/2022:MOTION AGREED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (F/B DFT EDYTA KNOBLOCH)

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

10/03/2022:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Notes: AS TO DFT, UNKNOWN TENANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION AGREED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (F/B DFT EDYTA KNOBLOCH); Notes: AGREED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (F/B DFT EDYTA KNOBLOCH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: (AGREED) TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DFT KNOBLOCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS F/B ATTY BARRY M LEFF ESQ ON BEHALF OF DFT EDYTA KNOBLOCH 49005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4601605; Receipt Amount: $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $436.60; total Amount Paid: $436.60; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/06/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/06/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/06/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/31/2022; Description: Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due: $5.60; Amount Paid: $5.60; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/31/2022; Description: 800F1 CircCivil Real Prop $50,000 or < PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Efilings@kbrlegal.com;kgreen@kbrlegal.com AS TO DFT EDYTA KNOBLOCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Efilings@kbrlegal.com;kgreen@kbrlegal.com AS TO DFT UNKNOWN TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Efilings@kbrlegal.com;kgreen@kbrlegal.com AS TO DFT RICKEY BROWN TRUSTEE OF THE 600 LAND TRUST DATED OCTOBER 27 2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $406.60 ON RECEIPT 4596766; Notes: $406.60 4596766 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33819 PAGE 260-260; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PRADO CONDOMINIUM WPB ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAREN ANN GREEN