This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/26/2022 at 15:12:42 (UTC).

THE MOLD MAN INC (A/A/O GILBERT EVERTON) V AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 THE MOLD MAN INC A/A/O GILBERT EVERTON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

THE MOLD MAN INC (A/A/O GILBERT EVERTON)

Respondent and Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

STEADMAN , ANDREW A

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

MONTEVERDE , AMANDA S

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/16/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

11/16/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/16/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/16/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS REQUESTED

11/16/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

NOTICE OF FILING

11/16/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4683798

11/18/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4683798

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/05/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/05/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

12/06/2022:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - JUDGE CASTOR DTD 12/6/22

12/06/2022:ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - JUDGE CASTOR DTD 12/6/22

ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

12/06/2022:ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/12/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

12/16/2022:NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

ORDER EXTENDING TIME

12/20/2022:ORDER EXTENDING TIME

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT JUDGE CASTOR ON 12/20/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE; Notes: FB PLT'S ATTY ANDREW STEADMAN WITHIN FIRM AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 4C (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: FB DFT- TO RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCancelled SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP on 12/13/2022 10:00:00 AM due to; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL; Notes: CALENDAR CALL ON 4/14/23@1PM VIA ZOOM - JUDGE CASTOR DTD 12/6/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - JUDGE CASTOR DTD 12/6/22; Notes: MOTION TO WAIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - JUDGE CASTOR DTD 12/6/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: JOINT STIPULATION WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS F/B A MONTEVERDE OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA - 12/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 12/13/2022 10:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 12/13/2022 10:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4683798; Notes: $195.00 4683798 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: DEPO SET 3/28/23 AT 10:00 AM AS TO ANY AND ALL WITNESSES DESIGNATED AS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less