This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/14/2023 at 15:58:50 (UTC).

THE LANDS OF THE PRESIDENT CONDOMINIUM FIVE ASSOCIATION INC V PRESIDENTIAL WAY ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 THE LANDS OF THE PRESIDENT CONDOMINIUM FIVE ASSOCIATION INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PRESIDENTIAL WAY ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

THE LANDS OF THE PRESIDENT CONDOMINIUM FIVE ASSOCIATION INC

Defendant and Respondent

PRESIDENTIAL WAY ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSSIN , ALLEN E

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WILDER , LEONARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

01/11/2023:NOTICE OF MEDIATION

ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

12/29/2022:ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

12/28/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

AGREED ORDER J CURLEY DTD 12/27/22 DEFTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IS GRANTED.

12/27/2022:AGREED ORDER J CURLEY DTD 12/27/22 DEFTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IS GRANTED.

NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S NON-OBJECTION AND CONSENT TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

12/22/2022:NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S NON-OBJECTION AND CONSENT TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

12/20/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/16/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL

12/15/2022:MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL

CERTIFICATE

12/12/2022:CERTIFICATE

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

11/29/2022:NOTICE OF MEDIATION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/22/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

11/22/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/24/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED

10/10/2022:EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED

WITNESS LIST

10/10/2022:WITNESS LIST

WITNESS LIST

10/07/2022:WITNESS LIST

EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED

10/07/2022:EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED

DCM WITH NON-JURY TRIAL ORDER

08/24/2022:DCM WITH NON-JURY TRIAL ORDER

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION; Notes: NOTICE OF MEDIATION 02/13/2023 10:00:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL; Notes: J. CURLEY DTD 12/29/22 : AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL AND MEDIATION PROCEDURES. ACTIN SET FOR NON-JURY TRIAL ON A DOCKKET COMMENCING JULY 17 - SEPT 8, 2023 CAL CALL ON 7/7/23 @ 9:00AM CTRM 10G. **SEE ORD FOR DETAILS**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 12/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER J CURLEY DTD 12/27/22 DEFTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IS GRANTED.; Notes: J CURLEY DTD 12/27/22 DEFTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IS GRANTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S NON-OBJECTION AND CONSENT TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE; Notes: NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S NON-OBJECTION AND CONSENT TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION 12/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING 12/29/2022 08:30:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL; Notes: DEFENDANT, PRESIDENTIAL WAY ASSOCIATION, INC'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes: NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY TO ATTEND MEDIATION ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF THE LANDS OF THE PRESIDENT CONDOMINIUM FIVE ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION; Notes: NOTICE OF MEDIATION 12/22/2022 11:00:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL SUMMONS AND RETURN OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PRESIDENTIAL WAY ASSOCIATION, INC. SERVED PRESIDENTIAL WAY ASSOCIATION, INC - 04/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4421427; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/11/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/11/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4421427; Notes: $411.00 4421427 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AB: Circuit Civil Central - AB (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@rossinburrlaw.com;dschultz@rossinburrlaw.com AS TO PRESIDENTIAL WAY ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less