This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/18/2023 at 15:14:43 (UTC).

THE IMAGING CENTER OF WEST PALM BEACH, LLC A/A/O SHARKA WEBSTER V STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 THE IMAGING CENTER OF WEST PALM BEACH, LLC A/A/O SHARKA WEBSTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

THE IMAGING CENTER OF WEST PALM BEACH, LLC A/A/O SHARKA WEBSTER

Defendant and Respondent

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DOYLE , CONOR J.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/09/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/09/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4737678

01/10/2023:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4737678

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/10/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/03/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

02/09/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: SERVED ON STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 2/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4737678; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/10/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/10/2023; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@BOTTARIANDDOYLE.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 2/9/2023 10:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 2/9/2023 10:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4737678; Notes: $65.00 4737678 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less