This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/07/2023 at 14:13:46 (UTC).

THE IMAGING CENTER OF WEST PALM BEACH A/A/O STACY ANN WILSON V STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 THE IMAGING CENTER OF WEST PALM BEACH A/A/O STACY ANN WILSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SILVER , ORI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

THE IMAGING CENTER OF WEST PALM BEACH A/A/O STACY ANN WILSON

Defendant and Respondent

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

DOYLE , CONOR J.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KIVIROGLU-GROELING , KARMEN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/15/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/15/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4714843

12/16/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4714843

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/20/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/23/2023:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

DCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER

01/23/2023:DCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/23/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/23/2023:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

01/24/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/26/2023:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes: DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: WITHOUT PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLAINTIFF NOT PRESENT, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B KARMEN KIVIROGLU-GROELING OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER; Notes: CALENDAR CALL ON 12/15/23@9:30AM- VIA ZOOM -JUDGE SILVER DTD 1/23/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: F/B BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY -VIA FLA CFO 12/20/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4714843; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/16/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/16/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@BOTTARIANDDOYLE.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 1/24/2023 9:30 AM SILVER, ORI; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 1/24/2023 9:30 AM SILVER, ORI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4714843; Notes: $65.00 4714843 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less