This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/04/2023 at 19:01:24 (UTC).

THE CEI GROUP INC A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AS THIRD PARTY ADMINISTRATOR FOR USIC LLC V VALLERY, PERARD

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 THE CEI GROUP INC A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AS THIRD PARTY ADMINISTRATOR FOR USIC LLC filed an Other lawsuit against VALLERY, PERARD. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

THE CEI GROUP INC A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AS THIRD PARTY ADMINISTRATOR FOR USIC LLC

Defendant and Respondent

VALLERY , PERARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FISHER , STACEY S

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/23/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

02/23/2023:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/23/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/23/2023:COMPLAINT

PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 4791069

02/24/2023:PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 4791069

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/15/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/17/2023:MOTION TO DISMISS

ORDER SETTING HEARING

03/27/2023:ORDER SETTING HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: ORDER SETTING MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 1:30 PM ZOOM SARAH L. SHULLMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes: F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE PERARD VALLERY - 03/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4791069; Receipt Amount: $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $410.00; total Amount Paid: $410.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/24/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/24/2023; Description: 407FF County Civil Claim > $15000 <= $30000; Amount Due: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 4791069; Notes: $410.00 4791069 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Pleadings@sprechmanlaw.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less