This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 22:49:08 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006-26 V DIXON, BEVERLY

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006-26 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DIXON, BEVERLY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF THE CWABS INC ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006-26

Respondents and Defendants

DELRAY LAKES ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

DIXON , BEVERLY

DIXON , PRINCE

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST A NAMED DEFENDANT TO THIS ACTION OR HAVING OR CLAIMING TO HAVE ANY RIGHT TITLE OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY HEREIN DESCRIBED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DOLAN , IAN

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS

05/18/2022:LIS PENDENS

PAID $2.00 ON RECEIPT 4515032

06/27/2022:PAID $2.00 ON RECEIPT 4515032

PAID $27.60 ON RECEIPT 4505241

06/17/2022:PAID $27.60 ON RECEIPT 4505241

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

06/16/2022:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS

06/16/2022:RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

05/27/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/27/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/27/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/27/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

05/27/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

PAID $1,965.60 ON RECEIPT 4471409

05/19/2022:PAID $1,965.60 ON RECEIPT 4471409

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/18/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE NOTICE OF HOMEOWNERS F/B PLT

05/18/2022:NOTICE NOTICE OF HOMEOWNERS F/B PLT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4515032; Receipt Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $2.00 ON RECEIPT 4515032; Notes: $2.00 4515032 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4505241; Receipt Amount: $27.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $1,995.20; total Amount Paid: $1,995.20; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/17/2022; Description: VDAL Voluntary Dismissal Legal Description; Amount Due: $0.60; Amount Paid: $0.60; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/17/2022; Description: VD2P Volun Diss Each Additional Page $8.50; Amount Due: $17.00; Amount Paid: $17.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/17/2022; Description: VD1P Volun Diss 1st Page $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $27.60 ON RECEIPT 4505241; Notes: $27.60 4505241 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/16/2022; Description: INDX $1 Index Fee each party after 4; Amount Due: $2.00; Amount Paid: $2.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes: DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Answers@DALlegal.com ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Answers@DALlegal.com ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Answers@DALlegal.com ISSUED TO PRINCE DIXON EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Answers@DALlegal.com ISSUED TO DELRAY LAKES ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Answers@DALlegal.com ISSUED TO THE BEVERLY DIXON EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE NOTICE OF HOMEOWNERS F/B PLT; Notes: NOTICE OF HOMEOWNERS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33580 PAGE 1692-1693; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED COMPLAIN FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLAN , IAN C