Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/24/2021 at 18:34:13 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. V YAQUB, INAM M

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YAQUB, INAM M. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

YAQUB , INAM M

West Palm Beach, FL 33411-8200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FORNARO , MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/19/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

04/14/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

COMPLAINT

04/14/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3988894

04/15/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3988894

SUMMONS REQUESTED

04/14/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:ZOOM DIVISION RL (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE INAM M YAQUB - 04/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3988894; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/15/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/15/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:LAWFIRMFL@RSIEH.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 5/18/2021 1:15 PM GARRISON, JUDGEEDWARD A; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 5/18/2021 1:15 PM GARRISON, JUDGEEDWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3988894; Notes:$310.00 3988894 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORNARO, MATTHEW