This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/30/2022 at 19:11:03 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. V SESSA, JOHN

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SESSA, JOHN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

SESSA , JOHN

Lake Worth, FL 33467-5274

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FORNARO , MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/31/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/31/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

08/31/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4597671

09/01/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4597671

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/01/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/11/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6M (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE JOHN SESSA - 09/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4597671; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/01/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/01/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LAWFIRMFL@RAUSCHSTURM.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 9/29/2022 9:30 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 9/29/2022 9:30 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4597671; Notes: $310.00 4597671 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORNARO, MATTHEW