Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/25/2021 at 03:02:36 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK V TORRES, SHERI

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 TD BANK USA, N A AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TORRES, SHERI. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PARNOFIELLO , JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PARNOFIELLO , JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK

Defendant and Respondent

TORRES , SHERI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FORNARO , MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/20/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

04/13/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

COMPLAINT

04/13/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3987235

04/14/2021:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3987235

SUMMONS REQUESTED

04/13/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/13/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:ZOOM DIVISION RJ (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE SHERI TORRES - 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3987235; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/14/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/14/2021; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:LAWFIRMFL@RSIEH.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 6/3/2021 1:30 PM PARNOFIELLO, JUDGEJOHN; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 6/3/2021 1:30 PM PARNOFIELLO, JUDGEJOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3987235; Notes:$185.00 3987235 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORNARO, MATTHEW