This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/14/2020 at 19:13:08 (UTC).

TBF FINANCIAL LLC V ZOLDAN, IRENE S

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 TBF FINANCIAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ZOLDAN, IRENE S. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TBF FINANCIAL LLC

Defendant and Respondent

ZOLDAN , IRENE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

NORTH , GLORIA O

 

Court Documents

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3679139

07/20/2020:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3679139

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 3679139

07/10/2020:PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 3679139

SUMMONS REQUESTED

07/10/2020:SUMMONS REQUESTED

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:SB; Room:#7 (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3679139; Receipt Amount: $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3679139; Notes:$310.00 3679139 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketREVISED RECEIPT 3679139; Notes:3679139

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:GLORIA@NORTHPA.NET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 9/30/2020 10:00 AM BRYSON, JUDGEMARNI; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 9/30/2020 10:00 AM BRYSON, JUDGEMARNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 3679139; Notes:$320.00 3679139 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less