This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/19/2021 at 17:38:12 (UTC).

TABERNILLA, OLGA C

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 TABERNILLA, OLGA C was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIS , SARAH and JOHNSON , LAURA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WILLIS , SARAH

JOHNSON , LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

TABERNILLA , OLGA T

Decedent

TABERNILLA , OLGA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

COONEY , ROSEMARY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 32178 PAGE 54-55; Notes:S/B JUDGE JOHNSON ON 2/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REP; Notes:OLGA T TABERNILLA S/B JUDGE JOHNSON ON 2/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:FOR CARLOS VICTOR TABERNILLA (ORIGINAL) F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:FOR FRANCISCO LUIS TABERNILLA (ORIGINAL) F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSTATUS ORDER; Notes:LISTED ITEMS ARE REQUIRED TO BE FILED WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER JDG L JOHNSON DTD 1/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3875721; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/15/2021; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3875721; Notes:$401.00 3875721 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:EFILED OF FRANCISCO L TABERNILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:EFILED OF CARLOS V TABERNILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:RC@PROBATEGT.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes:F/B OLGA T TABERNILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketUNEXECUTED NOTICE OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PR AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B OLGA T TABERNILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:ID: Probate Central, MH, Guardianship - ID (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less