This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 12:30:18 (UTC).

SYMONS FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC P.A. A/A/O KIMBERLY HOUGH V FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 SYMONS FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC P A A/A/O KIMBERLY HOUGH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SYMONS FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC P.A. A/A/O KIMBERLY HOUGH

Defendant and Respondent

FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FISCHETTI , MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/07/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/07/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

01/07/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4306758

01/10/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4306758

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/18/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

02/15/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 01/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4306758; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$65.00; total Amount Paid:$65.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:01/10/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:01/10/2022; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:MFPAESQ@GMAIL.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 2/15/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 2/15/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4306758; Notes:$65.00 4306758 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Symons Family Chiropractic, PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fischetti, Michael James