This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/26/2022 at 02:21:12 (UTC).

SUN VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC V MILLER, DANIEL A

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 SUN VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MILLER, DANIEL A. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SUN VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT

Defendants and Respondents

DISCOVER BANK

LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019-SL3 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INVIDIDUAL CAPACITY BY SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE

MILLER , BARBARA

MILLER , DANIEL A

ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS, SPOUSES, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES OR CLAIMANTS BY AND THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST BARBARA MILLER, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

EISENBERG , AMY O

SUGARMAN , DEBORAH S

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CRIPPS , STEVEN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/16/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING

02/07/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

02/07/2022:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REPORT

01/20/2022:REPORT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

12/06/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

11/16/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

CLERK'S DEFAULT

11/16/2021:CLERK'S DEFAULT

NOTICE WITHDRAWAL OF CLERK & COMPTROLLER'S NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED COPIES EMAILED TO EFILINGS@KBRLEGAL.COM; DSUGARMAN@KBRLEGAL.COM

11/16/2021:NOTICE WITHDRAWAL OF CLERK & COMPTROLLER'S NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED COPIES EMAILED TO EFILINGS@KBRLEGAL.COM; DSUGARMAN@KBRLEGAL.COM

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

11/09/2021:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

PAID $456.60 ON RECEIPT 4161315

09/01/2021:PAID $456.60 ON RECEIPT 4161315

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/31/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/31/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/31/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/31/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/31/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

08/31/2021:LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

08/31/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/31/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING SPECIAL SET (IN PERSON HEARING) 04/04/2022 08:15:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Notes:MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENTF/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT; Notes:REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION; Notes:NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION; Notes:TO ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS OR AGAINST BARBARA MILLER DECEASED LKA 9288 SUN POINTE DRIVE BOYNTON BEACH, FL 33437 PBDBR 11/24/2021 & 12/1/2021 **COPIES PROVIDED FOR MAILING**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:EFILINGS@KBRLEGAL.COM; DSUGARMAN@KBRLEGAL.COM AGAINST DFTS LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019-SL3 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BY SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE & DISCOVER BANK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE WITHDRAWAL OF CLERK & COMPTROLLER'S NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED COPIES EMAILED TO EFILINGS@KBRLEGAL.COM; DSUGARMAN@KBRLEGAL.COM; Notes:WITHDRAWAL OF CLERK & COMPTROLLER'S NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED COPIES EMAILED TO EFILINGS@KBRLEGAL.COM; DSUGARMAN@KBRLEGAL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED; Notes:EFILINGS@KBRLEGAL.COM; DSUGARMAN@KBRLEGAL.COM AS TO DFTS - LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019-SL3 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BY SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE & DISCOVER BANK **CERT OF SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT NEEDED.**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Notes:ALL UNKNOWN TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $456.60 ON RECEIPT 4161315; Notes:$456.60 4161315 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com UNKNOWN TENANT SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019-SL3 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INVIDIDUAL CAPACITY BY SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com DISCOVER BANK SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com DANIEL A MILLER SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com BARNARA MILLER SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32844 PAGE 475-475; Notes:FB PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR FORECLOSURE; FB PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less