This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/13/2021 at 17:28:58 (UTC).

SUN VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC V CRESPO CALERO, OMAR

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 SUN VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CRESPO CALERO, OMAR. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KERNER , SCOTT and MARX , JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KERNER , SCOTT

MARX , JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SUN VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Respondents

CRESPO CALERO , OMAR

CASTANEDA , YESENIA

UNKNOWN TENANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

EISENBERG , AMY O

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/29/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS

10/29/2020:LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/29/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/29/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/29/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $436.60 ON RECEIPT 3796665

10/30/2020:PAID $436.60 ON RECEIPT 3796665

COMPLAINT

10/29/2020:COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/09/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER JMARX DTD 02/10/2021 ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IS HEREBY GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE ON THE DFTS.

02/10/2021:ORDER JMARX DTD 02/10/2021 ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IS HEREBY GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE ON THE DFTS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER JMARX DTD 02/10/2021 ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IS HEREBY GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE ON THE DFTS.; Notes:JMARX DTD 02/10/2021 ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IS HEREBY GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE ON THE DFTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT F.B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3796665; Receipt Amount: $436.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$436.60; total Amount Paid:$436.60; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/30/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/30/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/30/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/30/2020; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/30/2020; Description:800F1 CircCivil Real Prop $50,000 or < PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $436.60 ON RECEIPT 3796665; Notes:$436.60 3796665 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com ISSUED TO YESENIA CASTANEDA EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com ISSUED TO OMAR CRESPO-CALERO EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 31883 PAGE 1475-1475; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISENBERG , AMY O