This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 12/29/2021 at 19:23:52 (UTC).

STUART B KROST M.D. P.A. A/A/O DANIEL SANDS V STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 STUART B KROST M D P A A/A/O DANIEL SANDS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRISTOW , APRIL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRISTOW , APRIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STUART B KROST M.D. P.A. A/A/O DANIEL SANDS

Defendant and Respondent

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DALY , JOHN C

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DICHEK , JARRED S

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR:

11/30/2021:DEMAND FOR:

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

11/30/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/30/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

11/24/2021:NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE

11/24/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 57.105

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 57.105

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT LETTER ABOUT TRANSFER

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT LETTER ABOUT TRANSFER

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE TO APPEAR

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE TO APPEAR

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER BASED ON FORUM NON- CONVENIENS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE RULE

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER BASED ON FORUM NON- CONVENIENS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE RULE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF HEARING

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF HEARING

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING REOUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING REOUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFFS FIRST REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFFS FIRST REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF F[LING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF F[LING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.5[6(B)(1) AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

11/24/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.5[6(B)(1) AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:MB; Room:6L (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Notes:JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:FB DFT- DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY JARRED S DICHEK OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4260089; Receipt Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$55.00; total Amount Paid:$55.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/24/2021; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER; Notes:PIPPORTALLAW@GMAIL.COM;JD-KD@KUBICKIDRAPER.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE; Notes:PIPPORTALLAW@GMAIL.COM;JD-KD@KUBICKIDRAPER.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 1/5/2022 2:00 PM BRISTOW, APRIL; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 1/5/2022 2:00 PM BRISTOW, APRIL

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Notes:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT; Notes:COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT AGREED ORDER INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes:AGREED ORDER INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Notes:STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 4260089; Notes:$55.00 4260089 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes:PROGRESS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes:ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO PALM BEACH COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.