This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/27/2022 at 02:55:42 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION V RIVIERA TRADING AND MARKETING INC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against RIVIERA TRADING AND MARKETING INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

3NATIVES JUPITER WEST LLC

6671 PROPERTIES, INC

ALDI (FLORIDA) L.L.C

ALLEN SATER, D.P.M P.A.

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

BEAUTY BOUTIQUE SALON AND SPA INC

C.R. CHICKS JUPITER, INC

CAVCO ENTERPRISES, INC

CHOCOLATE SPECTRUM, LLC

COVELLI ENTERPRISES, INC

DEKR LLC

DUFFY'S OF JUPITER WEST, INC

EAST COAST POOL SUPPLY, INC

FABULOUS NAILS & WAX, INC

FLORIDA COMMUNITY BANK N.A.

GIO'S PIZZA INC

GRACE ARTEL INVESTORS LP

H & G VENTURES OF THE PALM BEACHES, LLC

H & R BLOCK EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INC

INDAKAR, LLC

88 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WYDNER , SEAN

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

02/21/2022:SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED RIVIERA TRADING AND MARKETING, INC - 02/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FLORIDA COMMUNITY BANK, N.A - 02/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED GRACE- ARTEL INVESTORS, L.P - 02/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BANK OF AMERICA, NA - 02/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JUPITER WEST MOBILE MART, INC - 02/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A - 2-7-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED PARK AVENUE BBQ & GRILLE OF JUPITER, INC - 02/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUNSHINE RESTAURANT MERGER SUB, LLC A DELAWARE LLC D/B/A IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC - 02/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TIJUANA FLATS #187 LLC - 02/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DEKR, LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, D/B/A SWEET FROG PREMIUM FROZEN YOGURT - 02/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
166 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/20/2021; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$0.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/20/2021; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$0.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/20/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$0.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33179 PAGE 792-844; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY CLAIM SHEET F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION; Notes:OF TAKING F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Notes:NOT RECORDED PURSUANT TO NON-COMPLIANCE W/ RJA 2.520** F/B PLT CC ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COVELLI ENTERPRISES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where H & R BLOCK EASTERN ENTERPRISES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALDI (FLORIDA) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Community Bank NA is a litigant