Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/12/2021 at 19:08:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION V JOMAR FLORIDA ENTERPRISES LLC

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against JOMAR FLORIDA ENTERPRISES LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLEY , GLENN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLEY , GLENN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Defendants and Respondents

CHEVRON USA INC

JOMAR FLORIDA ENTERPRISES LLC

DANIEL AND MAX LLC

PALM BEACH COUNTY

CRYSTAL PETROLEUM INC

4545 FORESTHILL CENTER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WYDNER , SEAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PELLGRINO , TARA SUZANNE

PETERSON , HAMPTON C

POLICASTRO , ANTHONY V

SIMON , BRENT E

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S DEFAULT

02/09/2021:CLERK'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/03/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR ORDER

02/02/2021:MOTION FOR ORDER

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/02/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/24/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/24/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/24/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/24/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

11/24/2020:ANSWER

DECLARATION

11/24/2020:DECLARATION

ACCEPTANCE

11/23/2020:ACCEPTANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/17/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION

09/28/2020:PETITION

DECLARATION

09/28/2020:DECLARATION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/28/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3906873; Receipt Amount: $81,100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$162,200.00; total Amount Paid:$162,200.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/12/2021; Description:Registry disbursement; Amount Due:$81,100.00; Amount Paid:$81,100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes:3906873 $81,100.00 SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP TRUST ACCOUNT C/O SUZANNE M. DRISCOLL, ESQ.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketREVISED RECEIPT 3906873; Notes:3906873

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes:3906873 $81,100.00 SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP TRUST ACCOUNT C/O SUSAN M. DRISCOLL, ESQ.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3905365; Receipt Amount: $81,100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/10/2021; Description:Eminent Domain Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due:$81,100.00; Amount Paid:$81,100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CLERK; Notes:CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $81,100.00 ON RECEIPT 3905365; Notes:$81,100.00 3905365 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION MOTION FOR SPECIAL SET HEARING ON THE ORDER OF TAKING; Notes:MOTION FOR SPECIAL SET HEARING ON THE ORDER OF TAKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/01/2020; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$0.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/01/2020; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$0.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/01/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$0.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION; Notes:OF TAKING F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 31801 PAGE 536-539; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY CLAIM SHEET F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pellegrino, Tara S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENT EVAN SIMON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICASTRO, ANTHONY VINCENT