This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/12/2022 at 05:06:54 (UTC).

ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY V GATY, GIORGIA

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against GATY, GIORGIA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARX , JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARX , JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

ABSENTEE HOME CARE AND MAINTENANCE ENTERPRISES INC

GATY , GIORGIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN , TYLER DANIEL

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HITZ , JOHN B

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/16/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EXHIBIT

03/16/2022:EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/25/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/25/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/25/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

04/21/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

04/21/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

04/21/2022:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

REQUEST

04/21/2022:REQUEST

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/21/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER EXTENDING TIME

05/02/2022:ORDER EXTENDING TIME

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME; Notes:OFTEDAL; TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS IS GRANTED; DFT GIORGIA GATY ISHALL HAVE 30DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS DTD 5/2/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO PLT DISCOVERY REQUESTS F/B DFT GIORGIA GATY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST; Notes:F/B DFT GIORGIA GATY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:MAY 13, 2022 THROUGH MAY 18, 2022 AND MAY 26, 2022 AND JUNE 3, 2022 F/B ATTY HINZ OBO DFT GIORGIA GATY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY HINZ OBO DFT GIORGIA GATY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:OF ELECTRONIC ADDRESS F/B ATTY HINZ OBO DFT GIORGIA GATY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO GIORGIA GATY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO ABSENTEE HOME CARE AND MAINTENANCE ENTERPRISES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$0.00; total Amount Paid:$0.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/24/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$0.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/24/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$0.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/24/2022; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$0.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Notes:AS TO WAIVER OF FEES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Service@blffl.com;Tbrown@blffl.com AS TO GIORGIA GATY EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Service@blffl.com;Tbrown@blffl.com AS TO ABSENTEE HOME CARE AND MAINTENANCE ENTERPRISES INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St Johns Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN , TYLER DANIEL