This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/10/2023 at 15:42:02 (UTC).

SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC SPECIALISTS OF SOUTH FLORIDA LLC AS ASSIGNEE RYAN EATON V PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC SPECIALISTS OF SOUTH FLORIDA LLC AS ASSIGNEE RYAN EATON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TEW , STEPHANIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TEW , STEPHANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC SPECIALISTS OF SOUTH FLORIDA LLC AS ASSIGNEE RYAN EATON

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PATTERER , MELISSA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/23/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/23/2023:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/23/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/23/2023:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/23/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

02/23/2023:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

SUMMONS REQUESTED

02/23/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4790994

02/24/2023:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4790994

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4790994; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/24/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/24/2023; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: MPATTERER@FORTHEPEOPLE.COM E ISSEUD TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 3/23/2023 2:30 PM TEW, STEPHANIE; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 3/23/2023 2:30 PM TEW, STEPHANIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4790994; Notes: $65.00 4790994 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less