This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/10/2023 at 15:41:54 (UTC).

SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC SPECIALISTS OF SOUTH FLORIDA, LLC A/A/O ESTEBAN CARRILLO V PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/01/2023 SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC SPECIALISTS OF SOUTH FLORIDA, LLC A/A/O ESTEBAN CARRILLO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SPINE AND ORTHOPEDIC SPECIALISTS OF SOUTH FLORIDA, LLC A/A/O ESTEBAN CARRILLO

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PATTERER , MELISSA

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

REMY , JASON P

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/01/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/01/2023:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/01/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/01/2023:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/01/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

03/01/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

SUMMONS REQUESTED

03/01/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4800008

03/03/2023:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4800008

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/03/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/17/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

04/03/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF FILING

04/03/2023:NOTICE OF FILING

DEMAND FOR:

04/03/2023:DEMAND FOR:

MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

04/03/2023:MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

04/04/2023:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

ORDER EXCUSING PARTIES FROM IN PERSON PRE-TRIAL AND DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - SIGNED JUDGE SHERMAN 4/4/2023

04/04/2023:ORDER EXCUSING PARTIES FROM IN PERSON PRE-TRIAL AND DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - SIGNED JUDGE SHERMAN 4/4/2023

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

04/05/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 6L (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PARTIES NO APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXCUSING PARTIES FROM IN PERSON PRE-TRIAL AND DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - SIGNED JUDGE SHERMAN 4/4/2023; Notes: EXCUSING PARTIES FROM IN PERSON PRE-TRIAL AND DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - SIGNED JUDGE SHERMAN 4/4/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: F/B BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT; Notes: TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Notes: FOR JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: OBJECTIONS TO ORDER ON AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ;F /B DFT ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - 03/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4800008; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 4/5/2023 1:30 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 4/5/2023 1:30 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4800008; Notes: $65.00 4800008 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 F/B ATTY MELISSA PATTERER OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST/TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: SERVICE OF/TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less