This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/17/2022 at 23:13:28 (UTC).

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC V MOSKOVIT, EVAN

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MOSKOVIT, EVAN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Respondents and Defendants

JOHNSON , STACI

MOSKOVIT , EVAN

SUN VALLEY COMMUNITY MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

SUN VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OF THE ESTATE OF HARVEY SIMONS A/K/A HARVEY LAWRENCE SIMONS DECEASED

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EVAN MOSKOVIT

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STACI JOHNSON

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 1

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 2

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 3

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SCOTT , JENNIFER MOUSER

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

LEE , SCOTT J.

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS BOOK 33623 PAGE 1387-1387

06/06/2022:LIS PENDENS BOOK 33623 PAGE 1387-1387

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/08/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

07/08/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/08/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/01/2022:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER

06/15/2022:ANSWER

PAID $1,015.60 ON RECEIPT 4493585

06/08/2022:PAID $1,015.60 ON RECEIPT 4493585

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/06/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COMPLAINT

06/06/2022:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/06/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT F/B DFTS THE ESTATE OF HARVEY SIMONS, STACI JOHNSON, PERSONALLY AND AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE ESTATE OF HARVEY SIMONS, UNKNONW SPOUSE OF STACI JOHNSON AND EVAN MOSKOVIT AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EVAN MOSKOVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY SCOTT J LEE OBO DFTS THE ESTATE OF HARVEY SIMONS, STACI JOHNSON, PERSONALLY AND AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE ESTATE OF HARVEY SIMONS, UNKNONW SPOUSE OF STACI JOHNSON AND EVAN MOSKOVIT AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EVAN MOSKOVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B ATTY SCOTT J LEE OBO DFTS THE ESTATE OF HARVEY SIMONS, STACI JOHNSON, PERSONALLY AND AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE ESTATE OF HARVEY SIMONS, UNKNONW SPOUSE OF STACI JOHNSON AND EVAN MOSKOVIT AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EVAN MOSKOVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: TO ANSWER AND PETITION TO PARTICIPATE IN SURPLUS (F/B PLT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT SUNVALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4493585; Receipt Amount: $1,015.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $1,015.60; total Amount Paid: $1,015.60; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/08/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/08/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/08/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eportal@kasslaw.com AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EVAN MOSKOVIT EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eportal@kasslaw.com AS TO SUNVALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eportal@kasslaw.com AS TO SUN VALLEY COMMUNITY MASTER ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eportal@kasslaw.com AS TO STACI JOHNSON AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF HARVEY SIMONS A/K/A HARVEY LAWRENCE SIMONS DECEASED EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eportal@kasslaw.com AS TO STACI JOHNSON AS KNOWN HEIR OF THE ESTATE OF HARVEY SIMONS A/K/A HARVEY LAWRENCE SIMONS DECEASED EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eportal@kasslaw.com AS TO EVAN MOSKOVIT AS KNOWN HEIR OF THE ESTATE OF HARVEY SIMONS A/K/A HARVEY LAWRENCE SIMONS DECEASED EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33623 PAGE 1387-1387; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott, Jennifer Mouser