This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 19:49:09 (UTC).

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC V BULEN, GORDON L

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BULEN, GORDON L. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants and Respondents

BULEN , GORDON L

TRUIST BANK

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GORDON L BULEN

VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIACION INC

WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

GUNER , CAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PICCIN , RAYMOND A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/10/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/10/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

LIS PENDENS

05/10/2022:LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICATE

05/10/2022:CERTIFICATE

COMPLAINT

05/10/2022:COMPLAINT

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

05/10/2022:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $966.60 ON RECEIPT 4460394

05/11/2022:PAID $966.60 ON RECEIPT 4460394

ANSWER

05/17/2022:ANSWER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/17/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/02/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/07/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

06/07/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GORDON L. BULEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TRUIST BANK F/K/A BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY - 05/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED GORDON L. BULEN - 06/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC. - 5/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: TO PLT'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE - F/B DFT WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4460394; Receipt Amount: $966.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $966.60; total Amount Paid: $966.60; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/11/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/11/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/11/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com ISSUED TO VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GORDON L BULEN EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com ISSUED TO TRUIST BANK EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com ISSUED TO GORDON L BULEN EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOC is a litigant

Latest cases where WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant