This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/27/2019 at 15:10:32 (UTC).

SP SAN MARCO GP LLC AS GENERAL PARTNER OF TRUST LAKE PARK LTD, DBA SAN MARCO VILLAS I APARTMENTS V TRIPP, JASON

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 SP SAN MARCO GP LLC AS GENERAL PARTNER OF TRUST LAKE PARK LTD, DBA SAN MARCO VILLAS I APARTMENTS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against TRIPP, JASON. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SP SAN MARCO GP LLC AS GENERAL PARTNER OF TRUST LAKE PARK LTD, DBA SAN MARCO VILLAS I APARTMENTS

Defendants and Respondents

TRIPP , JASON

MILLER , AMELITA

EDANO , CELINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DALY , WHITNEY H

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

11/25/2019:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

11/25/2019:RETURNED MAIL

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

11/14/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31027 PAGE 1924-1924

11/13/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31027 PAGE 1924-1924

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

11/06/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/06/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/06/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/06/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

11/06/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

11/06/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

11/06/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/29/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $215.00 ON RECEIPT 3386766

10/24/2019:PAID $215.00 ON RECEIPT 3386766

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/23/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/23/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:OF DFT CELINA COPY OF FINAL JMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:OF DFT AMELITA COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes:DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31027 PAGE 1924-1924; Notes:FOR EVICTION POSSESSION ONLY (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION). DTD 11/12/2019. JDG F CASTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes:DEFAULT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:AS TO JASON TRIP , CELINA EDANO AND AMELITA MILLER F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AMELITA MILLER SERVED 10/28/19 SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:CELINA EDANO SERVED 10/28/19 SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:JASON TRIPP SERVED 10/28/19 SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@MGFDLAW.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@MGFDLAW.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $215.00 ON RECEIPT 3386766; Notes:$215.00 3386766 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Receipt Number:3386766; Receipt Amount: $215.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$215.00; total Amount Paid:$215.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Due Date:10/24/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$30.00; Amount Paid:$30.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Due Date:10/24/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less