This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/27/2019 at 15:09:30 (UTC).

SP SAN MARCO GP LLC AS GENERAL PARTNER OF TRUST LAKE PARK LTD, DBA SAN MARCO VILLAS I APARTMENTS V SMALL, AARON

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 SP SAN MARCO GP LLC AS GENERAL PARTNER OF TRUST LAKE PARK LTD, DBA SAN MARCO VILLAS I APARTMENTS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SMALL, AARON. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SP SAN MARCO GP LLC AS GENERAL PARTNER OF TRUST LAKE PARK LTD, DBA SAN MARCO VILLAS I APARTMENTS

Defendant and Respondent

SMALL , AARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DALY , WHITNEY H

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF CONTINUANCE

11/08/2019:ORDER OF CONTINUANCE

MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT F/B PLT

11/07/2019:MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT F/B PLT

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL

11/07/2019:MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL

ORDER SETTING HEARING

11/07/2019:ORDER SETTING HEARING

PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 3402102

11/04/2019:PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 3402102

PAID $1,000.00 ON RECEIPT 3402092

11/04/2019:PAID $1,000.00 ON RECEIPT 3402092

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/29/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3387404

10/24/2019:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3387404

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/23/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/23/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF CONTINUANCE; Notes:OF MEDIATION AND HEARING ON DETERMINATION OF RENT - 12/3/19@ 10AM- JUDGE CASTOR DTD 11/8/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT F/B PLT; Notes:TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE CIVIL; Notes:FB PLT/ OF MEDIATION AND HEARING ON DETERMINATION OF RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:ORDER SCHEDULING MANDATORY MEDIATION AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DETERMINATION OF RENT 11/19/19 @10AM JUDGE CASTOR ON 11/7/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • ANSWER; Notes:AND DEPOSIT INTO CT REGISTRY. FB DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 3402102; Notes:$0.30 3402102 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $1,000.00 ON RECEIPT 3402092; Notes:$1,000.00 3402092 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@MGFDLAW.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3387404; Notes:$195.00 3387404 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Receipt Number:3402102; Receipt Amount: $0.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Receipt Number:3402092; Receipt Amount: $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Receipt Number:3387404; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$1,195.30; total Amount Paid:$1,195.30; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Due Date:11/04/2019; Description:Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due:$21.00; Amount Paid:$21.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Due Date:11/04/2019; Description:Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due:$979.00; Amount Paid:$979.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Due Date:11/04/2019; Description:CC County Civil Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$0.30; Amount Paid:$0.30; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Due Date:10/24/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Due Date:10/24/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less