This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/19/2019 at 02:26:05 (UTC).

SOUTHERN COAST ELECTRICAL SERVICES INC V TEDDER, KRISTIN I

Case Summary

On 07/24/2015 SOUTHERN COAST ELECTRICAL SERVICES INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TEDDER, KRISTIN I. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILLEN , JEFFREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILLEN , JEFFREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SOUTHERN COAST ELECTRICAL SERVICES INC

Defendants and Respondents

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KRISTIN I TEDDER

UNKNOWN PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF KRISTIN I

PALM BEACH COUNTY FLORIDA

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

TEDDER , KRISTIN I

ESTATE OF KRISTIN I TEDDER

HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DOUGHERTY , JAMES JOHN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MUGAVERO , PHILLIP

Other Attorneys

KITE-POWELL , JULIA

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - 10-2-2017

10/18/2017:FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - 10-2-2017

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

10/18/2017:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE - 10-2-2017

10/03/2017:FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE - 10-2-2017

PAID $6,680.75 ON RECEIPT 2358093

10/03/2017:PAID $6,680.75 ON RECEIPT 2358093

PAID $330.10 ON RECEIPT 2356105

10/02/2017:PAID $330.10 ON RECEIPT 2356105

FORECLOSURE PROCESS SALE - 10-2-2017

10/02/2017:FORECLOSURE PROCESS SALE - 10-2-2017

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

09/25/2017:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PAID $60.00 ON RECEIPT 2342365

09/20/2017:PAID $60.00 ON RECEIPT 2342365

PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 2342362

09/20/2017:PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 2342362

NOTICE OF SALE, SALE DATE 10/02/2017

09/07/2017:NOTICE OF SALE, SALE DATE 10/02/2017

FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE, COPIES MAILED, AMOUNT OF FJ $36,366.25, SALE DATE 10/02/2017, SIGNED DATE 08/18/2017 - J GILLEN BOOK 29350 PAGE 394-397

08/18/2017:FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE, COPIES MAILED, AMOUNT OF FJ $36,366.25, SALE DATE 10/02/2017, SIGNED DATE 08/18/2017 - J GILLEN BOOK 29350 PAGE 394-397

ORDER SETTING HEARING

06/28/2017:ORDER SETTING HEARING

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

06/27/2017:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

04/27/2017:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

ORDER OF DEFAULT

01/04/2017:ORDER OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/21/2016:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/17/2016:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

11/17/2016:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/18/2017
View Court Documents

DocketFORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - 10-2-2017; Notes:SERVICE@RASKRLAW.COM; COATTYFORECLOSURES@PBCGOV.ORG 157039737

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Notes:ISSUED TO SOUTHERN COAST ELECTRICAL SERVICES INC BK 29411 PG 1901

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017
View Court Documents

DocketFORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE - 10-2-2017; Notes:SOLD TO SOUTHERN COAST ELECTRICAL SERVICES INC FOR $43,200.00 SERVICE@KRASKERLAW.COM 157039737

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $6,680.75 ON RECEIPT 2358093; Notes:$6,680.75 2358093 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

DocketFORECLOSURE FEES ADDED - 10-2-2017; Notes:157039737

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2017
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $330.10 ON RECEIPT 2356105; Notes:$330.10 2356105 Balance Due: $6,680.75

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2017
View Court Documents

DocketFORECLOSURE PROCESS SALE - 10-2-2017; Notes:1 43200.00 36598.05 BID AND INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED 10-2-2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2017
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION; Notes:NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2017
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $60.00 ON RECEIPT 2342365; Notes:$60.00 2342365 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2017
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 2342362; Notes:$70.00 2342362 Balance Due: $60.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
10/02/2017

DocketDue Date:10/02/2017; Description:Registry Fee; Amount Due:$106.50; Amount Paid:$106.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2017

DocketDue Date:10/02/2017; Description:Foreclosure Sale Price; Amount Due:$6,601.95; Amount Paid:$6,601.95; Amount Balance:$0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2017

DocketDue Date:10/02/2017; Description:Civil Doc Stamps PB; Amount Due:$302.40; Amount Paid:$302.40; Amount Balance:$0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2017

DocketDue Date:09/22/2017; Description:Civil Foreclosure Online Sale Fee; Amount Due:$60.00; Amount Paid:$60.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2017

DocketDue Date:09/22/2017; Description:CA Foreclosure Sale Fee; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2015

DocketDue Date:08/04/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$20.00; Amount Paid:$20.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2015

DocketDue Date:08/03/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$30.00; Amount Paid:$30.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2015

DocketDue Date:07/28/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$69.00; Amount Paid:$69.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2015

DocketDue Date:07/28/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2015

DocketDue Date:07/28/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less