This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 15:28:09 (UTC).

SOUTH FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDICS AND SPORTS MEDICINE PA (ASSIGNEE OF KARINSKI, DEBRA) V LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 SOUTH FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDICS AND SPORTS MEDICINE PA ASSIGNEE OF KARINSKI, DEBRA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SILVER , ORI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SOUTH FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDICS AND SPORTS MEDICINE PA (ASSIGNEE OF KARINSKI, DEBRA)

Defendant and Respondent

LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KASPER , CHRIS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/23/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/23/2023:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/23/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/23/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/23/2023:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/23/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4754193

01/24/2023:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4754193

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/30/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/30/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/31/2023:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCancelled SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP on 3/14/2023 9:30:00 AM due to; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY 1/30/2023 CORPORATE LYNETTE COLEMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: LIBERTY MUTUAL PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY 1/30/2023 CORPORATE LYNETTE COLEMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4754193; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/24/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/24/2023; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SERVICE@WESETTHESTANDARDS.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 3/14/2023 9:30 AM SILVER, ORI; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 3/14/2023 9:30 AM SILVER, ORI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4754193; Notes: $65.00 4754193 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less