This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/02/2023 at 17:45:18 (UTC).

SOUTH FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDICS AND SPORTS MEDICINE P.A. (ASSIGNEE OF GUERRIER, ANGELICA) V PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 SOUTH FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDICS AND SPORTS MEDICINE P A ASSIGNEE OF GUERRIER, ANGELICA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SILVER , ORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SOUTH FLORIDA ORTHOPAEDICS AND SPORTS MEDICINE P.A. (ASSIGNEE OF GUERRIER, ANGELICA)

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KASPER , CHRIS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/13/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/13/2023:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/13/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/13/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/13/2023:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/13/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4742222

01/13/2023:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4742222

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/18/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SERVICE@WESETTHESTANDARDS.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4742222; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/13/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/13/2023; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 2/21/2023 9:30 AM SILVER, ORI; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 2/21/2023 9:30 AM SILVER, ORI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4742222; Notes: $65.00 4742222 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less