This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/14/2020 at 19:14:06 (UTC).

SORBELLO, SANTA V ZOIS, DANNY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 SORBELLO, SANTA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ZOIS, DANNY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SORBELLO , SANTA

Defendant and Respondent

ZOIS , DANNY

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

08/13/2020:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

07/27/2020:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/14/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

07/13/2020:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

INFORMATION SHEET

07/10/2020:INFORMATION SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/10/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PAID $140.00 ON RECEIPT 3679048

07/10/2020:PAID $140.00 ON RECEIPT 3679048

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • HearingSC - SHOW CAUSE; Location:SB; Room:#6 (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Notes:SIGN BY JUDGE R CORLEW ON 8/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:TO DANNY ZOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketSET FOR SC - SHOW CAUSE 8/13/2020 10:45 AM; Notes:SC - SHOW CAUSE 8/13/2020 10:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Notes:AS TO DANNY ZIOS 08/13/2020 @ 10:45AM VIA ZOOM-JUDGE CORLEW DTD 07/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3679048; Receipt Amount: $140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$140.00; total Amount Paid:$140.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:4R6FF CoCivil Claim < $1000 filed w/Replevin; Amount Due:$130.00; Amount Paid:$130.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:Summons $10.00; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $140.00 ON RECEIPT 3679048; Notes:$140.00 3679048 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less