This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/27/2022 at 09:52:59 (UTC).

SMITH, TEDRAL D V STAGG, DONALD

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 SMITH, TEDRAL D filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STAGG, DONALD. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SMITH , TEDRAL D

Defendant and Respondent

STAGG , DONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSENBLATT , ROBERT A

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FORTUNATO , RAPHAEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/27/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/27/2021:COMPLAINT

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4191817

09/28/2021:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4191817

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/30/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

10/01/2021:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4196723

10/01/2021:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4196723

ANSWER

10/29/2021:ANSWER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

10/29/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/29/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/29/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

10/29/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

12/10/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

02/01/2022:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

02/07/2022:NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF JURY TRIAL; Notes:F/B PLT UP 02/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:DEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY RAPHAEL FORTUNATO OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY RAPHAEL FORTUNATO OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4196723; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/01/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4196723; Notes:$10.00 4196723 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes:F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:rosenblattlaw@hotmail.com AS TO DFT DONALD STAGG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4191817; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/28/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4191817; Notes:$401.00 4191817 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AO: Circuit Civil Central - AO (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenblatt, Robert A