Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/19/2021 at 17:34:18 (UTC).

SMITH, ROBERT DUDLEY V FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 SMITH, ROBERT DUDLEY filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , GREGORY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , GREGORY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SMITH , ROBERT DUDLEY

Defendant and Respondent

FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SIMMS , JOELLE A

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/15/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3984848

04/13/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3984848

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION

04/09/2021:PETITION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/09/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC - 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3984848; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/13/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/13/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3984848; Notes:$411.00 3984848 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AA: Circuit Civil Central - AA (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jsimms@bressler.com;ktoulon@bressler.com ISSUED TO FINRA EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:ON A FORM OF A MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND EXPUNGEMENT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMMS , JOELLE A