This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/17/2019 at 14:51:18 (UTC).

SLATER, CORY V KESSLER, KEVIN MD

Case Summary

On 02/10/2015 SLATER, CORY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KESSLER, KEVIN MD. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SLATER, CORY

SLATER , CORY

Defendants and Respondents

KESSLER MD, KEVIN

KEVIN KESSLER MD PA

KESSLER SPORTS MEDICINE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ROBERTSON , ESQ, JAMES S.

ROBERTSON ESQ, JAMES S

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BLOOM , JOSH M

PARANZINO ESQ, MEGAN SINCORE

 

Court Documents

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/12/2019:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DISCLOSURE

06/12/2019:DISCLOSURE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

04/18/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

04/08/2019:ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

04/08/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/02/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

MEDIATION REPORT

04/02/2019:MEDIATION REPORT

EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED

03/14/2019:EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED

DISCLOSURE

03/14/2019:DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

03/14/2019:NOTICE OF MEDIATION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/11/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

05/03/2018:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/15/2018:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/19/2018:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/14/2017:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

AGREED ORDER

08/28/2015:AGREED ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/13/2015:NOTICE OF HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/17/2015:SUMMONS ISSUED

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION; Notes:JOINT PRE TRIAL - F/B PLT & DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:DUCES TECUM MARK SINNREICH MD 8/19/19 1PM F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISCLOSURE; Notes:EXPERT WITNESS F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WITNESS LIST; Notes:FACT F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED; Notes:EXHIBIT LIST F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT F/B DFTS; Notes:OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER KERNER; ON DFTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE IS GRANTED ( SEE ORDER DETAILS) DTD 4/23/2019; Notes:KERNER; ON DFTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE IS GRANTED ( SEE ORDER DETAILS) DTD 4/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER KERNER; ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF'S RESPONSES TO DFT WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS IS GRANTED DTD 4/23/2019; Notes:KERNER; ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLTF'S RESPONSES TO DFT WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS IS GRANTED DTD 4/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER S KERNER DTD. 4/22/19 MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE IS GRANTED. CASE WILL BE PLACED ON THE JURY TRIAL DOCKET BEGINNING 7/22/19 ENDING ON 9/13/19; Notes:S KERNER DTD. 4/22/19 MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE IS GRANTED. CASE WILL BE PLACED ON THE JURY TRIAL DOCKET BEGINNING 7/22/19 ENDING ON 9/13/19

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF CORY SLATER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF CORY SLATER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • CAFF; Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF CORY SLATER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • ADDITIONAL COMMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2015
  • Receipt Number:CAMB974022; Receipt Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • Receipt Number:CAMB972289; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2015
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$431.00; total Amount Paid:$431.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2015
  • Due Date:02/21/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$30.00; Amount Paid:$30.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • Due Date:02/12/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kevin J. Kessler, M.D., P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robertson, James S, III