This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/05/2023 at 15:06:37 (UTC).

SIMPLICITY JETS LLC V ROBY, BRADLEY

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 SIMPLICITY JETS LLC filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against ROBY, BRADLEY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SIMPLICITY JETS LLC

Defendant and Respondent

ROBY , BRADLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FISHER , STACEY S

 

Court Documents

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

03/02/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT

03/02/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT LETTER OF CORRESPONDENCE

03/02/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT LETTER OF CORRESPONDENCE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE

03/02/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER OF TRANSFER VENUE AND ORDER CLOSING CASE

03/02/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER OF TRANSFER VENUE AND ORDER CLOSING CASE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT UNIFORM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND RELATED REQUIREMENTS

03/02/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT UNIFORM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND RELATED REQUIREMENTS

CERTIFIED COPY

03/06/2023:CERTIFIED COPY

CERTIFIED COPY

03/06/2023:CERTIFIED COPY

NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

03/06/2023:NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 4803204

03/06/2023:PAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 4803204

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/16/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING

03/16/2023:NOTICE OF FILING

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

03/16/2023:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4823257

03/20/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4823257

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4823257; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $410.00; total Amount Paid: $410.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/20/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4823257; Notes: $10.00 4823257 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: COPY OF ORIGINAL COMPLAINT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: pleadings@sprechmanlaw.com;efiling@sprechmanlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4803204; Receipt Amount: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/06/2023; Description: 407FF County Civil Claim > $30001 <= $50000; Amount Due: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $400.00 ON RECEIPT 4803204; Notes: $400.00 4803204 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER; Notes: PLEADINGS@SPRECHMANLAW.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes: PROGRESS DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO PALM BEACH COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT UNIFORM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND RELATED REQUIREMENTS; Notes: UNIFORM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND RELATED REQUIREMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER OF TRANSFER VENUE AND ORDER CLOSING CASE; Notes: ORDER OF TRANSFER VENUE AND ORDER CLOSING CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE; Notes: MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT LETTER OF CORRESPONDENCE; Notes: LETTER OF CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT; Notes: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less