This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/20/2019 at 15:14:13 (UTC).

SILVER BEACH LLC V CAMPBELL, RONDALESHIA

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 SILVER BEACH LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CAMPBELL, RONDALESHIA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SILVER BEACH LLC

Defendant and Respondent

CAMPBELL , RONDALESHIA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

11/08/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31014 PAGE 689-689

11/07/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31014 PAGE 689-689

CLERK'S DEFAULT

11/05/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/01/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/23/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/16/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/16/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/16/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3370135

10/16/2019:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3370135

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

10/16/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/16/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes:FORWARD TO PBSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes:DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31014 PAGE 689-689; Notes:SIGNED ON 11/6/19 BY JDG F. CASTOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:DFT RONDALESHIA CAMPBELL FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:ON 10/21/19 BY POSTING TO RONDALESHIA CAMPBELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:AS TO DFT RONDALESHIA CAMPBELL **HANDED TO PLT OTC**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3370135; Notes:$195.00 3370135 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:AS TO DFT RONDALESHIA CAMPBELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Receipt Number:3370135; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$195.00; total Amount Paid:$195.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:Summons $10.00; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less