This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/31/2018 at 17:34:25 (UTC).

SIEVERT, SANDRA GAYLE

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 SIEVERT, SANDRA GAYLE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURTON , CHARLES E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURTON , CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIEVERT , JOSE

Decedent

SIEVERT , SANDRA GAYLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GWYNN , MARY ALICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:F/B MATTHEW SIEVERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER F/B MOLLY PONDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER F/B LUCAS SIEVERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER F/B SUSANNAH JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER F/B AMANDA MC INTOSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER F/B SARAH SUAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER F/B CHRISTINE EVANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • PAID $346.00 ON RECEIPT 2934588; Notes:$346.00 2934588 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IY: South Branch Probate - IY (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY GWYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • PAID FUNERAL BILL; Notes:F/B LUCAS SIEVERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • NON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes:F/B JOSE SIEVERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN; Notes:F/B ATTY GWYNN OBO JOSE SIEVERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Receipt Number:2934588; Receipt Amount: $346.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$346.00; total Amount Paid:$346.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Due Date:11/27/2018; Description:502FF Summary Administration $1000 or more; Amount Due:$346.00; Amount Paid:$346.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less