This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/19/2021 at 20:31:12 (UTC).

SHAPIRO, GARY

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 SHAPIRO, GARY was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSKAUER , SCOTT and WILLIS , SARAH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SUSKAUER , SCOTT

WILLIS , SARAH

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SHAPIRO , BRETT

GUYURON , LORA

WILLIAMSON , LEIGH

SHAPIRO , WHITNEY

Not Classified By Court

SHAPIRO , GARY

SHAPIRO , BARRYANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

TRUSHIN ESQ, BRADLEY H

MORRIS , ELLEN S

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ROUNTREE , SHANNON L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketRE-NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:RE-NOTICE OF UMC HEARING (VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCING) 03/09/2021 08:45:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF UMC HEARING (VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCING) 03/09/2021 08:45:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:BARRYANNE SHAPIRO'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO F.S. 744.331(7)(C)2 E-FILED BY ELLEN S. MORRIS, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DELINQUENCY; Notes:AND ORDER SETTING CONTEMPT HEARING FOR MARCH 4, 2021 @ 1:30 PM VIA ZOOM DTD 2/5/2021 S/B JUDGE: S. WILLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketORD SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL; Notes:THE LAW FIRM OF ELDER LAW ASSOCIATES PA IS NOW COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR THE PETITIONERS DTD 2/9/2021 S/B JUDGE: S. WILLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSTIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Notes:F/B ELLEN S. MORRIS, ESQ. & BRAD H. TRUSHIN, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSTIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Notes:F/B ELLEN S. MORRIS, ESQ. & BRAD H. TRUSHIN, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES; Notes:BARRYANNE SHAPIRO'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES E-FILED BY ALAN ROSENTHAL, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:BARRY ANNE SHAPIRO'S NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS TO RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: BARRYANNE SHAPIRO'S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN E-FILED BY CHARLES TROCKMORTON, ESQ.; Notes:BARRYANNE SHAPIRO'S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN E-FILED BY CHARLES TROCKMORTON, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:"EMERGENCY" ON 01/19/21 @1:00 PM RM#2711 BEFORE JDG WILLIS DTD 01/15/21 S/B JDG MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL; Notes:DTD 01/15/21 S/B JDG MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT CIVIL; Notes:BTRUSHIN@CTLLP.COM; PROBATESERVICE@CTLLP.COM TO ATTY BRADLEY H. TRUSHIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IJ: North Branch Probate - IJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3875710; Notes:$401.00 3875710 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION OF GUARDIAN; Notes:F/B PET LORA GUYURON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAFF / FOUND NOT INDIGENT; Notes:NOT INDIGENT - GARY SHAPIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF ETG DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE F/B PET LORA GUYURON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION APPTG EMER TEMP GDN; Notes:F/B ATTY BRADLEY H TRUSHIN OBO PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IC: Probate Central, MH, Guardianship - IC (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROUNTREE , SHANNON L