This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 10/20/2021 at 19:49:09 (UTC).

SHANAPHY, GREGORY A V FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 SHANAPHY, GREGORY A filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SHANAPHY , GREGORY A

Defendant and Respondent

FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SIMMS , JOELLE A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/15/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION

09/15/2021:PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4179386

09/17/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4179386

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/22/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

FINAL ORDER

10/12/2021:FINAL ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes:DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL ORDER; Notes:KASTRENAKES DTD 10/8/21: AND JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND EXPUNGEMENT GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC - 09/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4179386; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/17/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/17/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4179386; Notes:$411.00 4179386 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jsimms@bressler.com;ktoulon@bressler.com ISSUED TO FINRA EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:IN THE FORM OF A MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AMD EXPUNGEMENT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMMS , JOELLE A