This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 01/23/2019 at 17:36:01 (UTC).

SHAFFER, LEONARD GRAHAM

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 SHAFFER, LEONARD GRAHAM was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSKAUER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSKAUER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOBAUGH , NANCY L

Decedent

SHAFFER , LEONARD GRAHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

QUARTELL , JARED

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:JOINDER F/B SOOANN BOEHM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • NOTICE FORMAL TO MELISSA CARROLL F/B ATTY QUARTELL; Notes:FORMAL TO MELISSA CARROLL F/B ATTY QUARTELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • NOTICE FORMAL TO SOOANN BOEHN F/B ATTY QUARTELL; Notes:FORMAL TO SOOANN BOEHN F/B ATTY QUARTELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • PAID $346.00 ON RECEIPT 2967875; Notes:$346.00 2967875 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IJ: North Branch Probate - IJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER - F/B TODD FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER - F/B TOSS FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER - F/B JOHN FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER - F/B KAREN SHAFFER NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER - F/B NANCY HOBAUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER - F/B DENNIS SHAFFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:AND JOINDER - F/B GEORGE FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF ESTHER SHAFFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF HELEN SHAFFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • UNEXECUTED NOTICE OF CREDITORS; Notes:F/B NANCY HOBAUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN; Notes:F/B NANCY HOBAUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Receipt Number:2967875; Receipt Amount: $346.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$346.00; total Amount Paid:$346.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Due Date:12/20/2018; Description:502FF Summary Administration $1000 or more; Amount Due:$346.00; Amount Paid:$346.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less