This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/19/2022 at 15:21:26 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC V SMITH, YASMINDA

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SMITH, YASMINDA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC

Respondent and Defendant

SMITH , YASMINDA

Boca Raton, FL 33434-4858

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHERON , MOURA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/10/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/10/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

05/10/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

05/10/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4460763

05/11/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4460763

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/24/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

REQUEST

06/06/2022:REQUEST

ORDER CONTINUING PRE-TRIAL HEARING 7/27/2022 AT 10:00 A.M. - SIGNED JUDGE CORLEW 6/14/2022

06/14/2022:ORDER CONTINUING PRE-TRIAL HEARING 7/27/2022 AT 10:00 A.M. - SIGNED JUDGE CORLEW 6/14/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM DIVISION RD (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CONTINUING PRE-TRIAL HEARING 7/27/2022 AT 10:00 A.M. - SIGNED JUDGE CORLEW 6/14/2022; Notes: CONTINUING PRE-TRIAL HEARING 7/27/2022 AT 10:00 A.M. - SIGNED JUDGE CORLEW 6/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST; Notes: FOR POSTPONEMENT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE YASMINDA SMITH - 05/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4460763; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/11/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/11/2022; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@TMPPLLC.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 6/15/2022 10:00 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 6/15/2022 10:00 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4460763; Notes: $185.00 4460763 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY MOURA SHERON OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK J.CREW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHERON , MOURA