Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/24/2021 at 17:26:18 (UTC).

SCHELL, JAMES J V UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 SCHELL, JAMES J filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SCHELL , JAMES J

SCHELL , ROBIN

Defendant and Respondent

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BERNSTEIN , JOHN S

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/21/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3990076

04/16/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3990076

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/14/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/14/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/14/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/14/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

COMPLAINT

04/14/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION - 4/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3990076; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/16/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/16/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3990076; Notes:$411.00 3990076 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:service@bpinjury.com AS TO UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:VIDEO DUCES TECUM OF DFTS FIELD ADJUSTER ON TBD @ TBD F/B ATTY BERNSTEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:VIDEO DUCES TECUM OF DFTS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE ON TBD @ TBD F/B ATTY BERNSTEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST TO DFT F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:FIRST SET TO DFT F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bernstein, John Stat