This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/05/2022 at 19:29:48 (UTC).

SCG ATLAS WELLINGTON LLC V WASHINGTON, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 SCG ATLAS WELLINGTON LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WASHINGTON, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SCG ATLAS WELLINGTON LLC

Defendant and Respondent

WASHINGTON , MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LOWENHAUPT , KENNETH J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

07/27/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4552611

07/28/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4552611

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/09/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/15/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/24/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

08/24/2022:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT

08/24/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

08/24/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

08/26/2022:CLERK'S DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33814 PAGE 445-445

08/29/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33814 PAGE 445-445

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33814 PAGE 445-445; Notes: FOR POSSESSION AND ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO "CLOSE" THE FILE 8/29/22 JUDGE SARA ALIJEWICZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: MICHAEL WASHINGTON F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT; Notes: OF RENT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: DEFAULT FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: AND DEFAULT (PROPOSED UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT INCLUDED) F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE VERIFIED POSTED MICHAEL WASHINGTON - 08/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4552611; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/28/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/28/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: PLEDINGS@FL-LANDLORD.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4552611; Notes: $195.00 4552611 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCG ATLAS WELLINGTON LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNETH LOWENHAUPT