This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 21:31:55 (UTC).

SCG ATLAS WELLINGTON LLC V SAINTIL, EMMANUELLE

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 SCG ATLAS WELLINGTON LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SAINTIL, EMMANUELLE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SCG ATLAS WELLINGTON LLC

Defendant and Respondent

SAINTIL , EMMANUELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LOWENHAUPT , KENNETH J

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WOODBURN , LISA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

11/23/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4691282

11/28/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4691282

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/06/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/15/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/16/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT F/B DFT

12/16/2022:MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT F/B DFT

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/19/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER SETTING HEARING

12/20/2022:ORDER SETTING HEARING

EXHIBIT

01/09/2023:EXHIBIT

STIPULATION AND ORDER BOOK 34064 PAGE 1210-1210

01/10/2023:STIPULATION AND ORDER BOOK 34064 PAGE 1210-1210

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes: DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER BOOK 34064 PAGE 1210-1210; Notes: FOR JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AND DAMAGES UPON DEFAULT AND DISMISSAL JUDGE ALIJEWICZ ON 1/10/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Notes: PLT'S COMPOSITE "C" LEDGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: MEDIATION & RENT DETERMINATION ON JAN 10 2023 @ 1:30PM, RM #2 -JUDGE ALIJEWICZ 12/20/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: TO COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT F/B DFT; Notes: TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B L WOODBURN OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE VERIFIED SERVED EMMANUELLE SAINTIL - 12/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4691282; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/28/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/28/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4691282; Notes: $195.00 4691282 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: pleadings@fl-landlord.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less